U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00198
  • Case Name: Moore v. Mobile Medic Ambulance Service, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Joinder in Document]
  • April 21, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 21, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
  • April 21, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 14, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Remand]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 28, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 27, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.