U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00043-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Wences et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • April 08, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 08, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 08, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 07, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 05, 2025: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
  • April 04, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
  • April 02, 2025: [Sever Defendant]
  • April 02, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 02, 2025: [Suppress]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 01, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 31, 2025: [Exclude]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • March 24, 2025: [Exclude]
  • March 24, 2025: [Compel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.