U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00060
  • Case Name: Mazara v. Kare-in-Home Health Services, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Rule 16(a) Initial Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 16, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 26, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 24, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.