U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00683
  • Case Name: Onema v. Dolgencorp, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Notice of Service of Designation of Experts]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Service of Request for Production]
  • April 04, 2025: [Subpoena Returned]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
  • March 26, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 25, 2025: [Protective Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.