open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:16-cv-01191
    Party Name:Smith v. Colvin
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Magistrate Assignment (ADMIN USE ONLY)]
    Date Published:August 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transfer Order (ADMIN USE ONLY!)]
    Date Published:August 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum Opinion]
    Date Published:July 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter Magistrate Consent Non-Compliance]
    Date Published:July 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:July 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [A Docket Text Order with Schedules]
    Date Published:May 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
    Date Published:April 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:April 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:October 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:October 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA JUDGMENT]
    Date Published:October 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Opinion from USCA]
    Date Published:October 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:October 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:September 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Docket Modification]
    Date Published:September 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Remand]
    Date Published:September 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:September 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:September 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remand]
    Date Published:September 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:July 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark]
    Date Published:May 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:May 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Full Consent to a Magistrate]
    Date Published:April 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Text Entry Only Information]
    Date Published:April 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Management Order]
    Date Published:April 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assignment Local Rule 2.08]
    Date Published:April 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Opening Notification]
    Date Published:April 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Financial Affidavit - CJA 23]
    Date Published:April 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint (Social Security)]
    Date Published:April 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Transcript]
    Date Published:April 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Receipt]
    Date Published:April 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:April 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Notification and/or Briefing Schedule from USCA]
    Date Published:March 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notification of Appeal and NOA Supplement]
    Date Published:March 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appeal]
    Date Published:March 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:March 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Receipt]
    Date Published:March 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum & Order]
    Date Published:March 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Entry of Appearance]
    Date Published:February 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension]
    Date Published:February 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement of Material Facts]
    Date Published:February 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension]
    Date Published:February 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Social Security Cross Brief (govt only)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Oral Argument]
    Date Published:January 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Magistrate Assignment Returned]
    Date Published:January 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:January 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule)]
    Date Published:January 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [A Docket Text Order]
    Date Published:December 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Substitute Attorney/Law Firm]
    Date Published:December 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
    Date Published:December 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply Suggestions to Motion]
    Date Published:December 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Social Security Brief]
    Date Published:December 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:December 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Attorney Fees]
    Date Published:November 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reassign/Transfer Case]
    Date Published:November 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:November 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:October 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit]
    Date Published:October 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Transferring/Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:October 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Mandate]
    Date Published:October 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
    Date Published:September 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Judgment and/or Opinion]
    Date Published:August 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Financial Affidavit]
    Date Published:July 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Submission of administrative record]
    Date Published:July 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:July 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Magistrate Assignment]
    Date Published:July 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Social Security brief by defendant]
    Date Published:July 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:July 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:June 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint - Social Security]
    Date Published:June 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Social Security reply brief by plaintiff]
    Date Published:June 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Social Security Reply Brief]
    Date Published:June 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Suggestions in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:April 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:March 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing Cancellation]
    Date Published:January 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Social Security complaint]
    Date Published:December 30, 2014
  • Filing Type:Civil [Return of service of Social Security Complaint]
    Date Published:December 18, 2014
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:December 18, 2014
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion to extend Social Security Deadlines]
    Date Published:December 17, 2014
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transcript of certified administrative hearing]
    Date Published:December 10, 2014
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued as to USA]
    Date Published:December 02, 2014
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on motion for extension of Social Security deadlines]
    Date Published:December 01, 2014
  • Filing Type:Civil [Social Security brief by plaintiff]
    Date Published:November 24, 2014
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:November 24, 2014
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Judgment]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment - (Case)]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.moed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?133055
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =