open-public-records

U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:1:20-mj-04109-1
    Party Name:USA v. Suppressed
  • Filing Type:[Marshal's Return]
    Date Published:June 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:[Administrative Order re: Search Warrants]
    Date Published:March 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:[Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:March 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:[Pro Se Motion]
    Date Published:October 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
    Date Published:June 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Commitment to Another District]
    Date Published:June 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Rule 5(c)(3) Removal (Identity) Hearing]
    Date Published:June 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Rule 5 Papers]
    Date Published:May 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:May 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Status Conference]
    Date Published:May 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [NextGen Remark]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:September 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion for Extension of Time re Transcript]
    Date Published:August 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Redacted Document]
    Date Published:August 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Minutes (generic set/reset/satisfy schedules only)]
    Date Published:June 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:[~Util - Document Sealed]
    Date Published:June 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Redacted Search Warrant Issued]
    Date Published:May 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Search/PLI Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:February 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Seal]
    Date Published:February 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Seal]
    Date Published:February 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Waiver of Examination or Preliminary Hearing]
    Date Published:December 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:December 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
    Date Published:December 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Waiver of Rule 5(c)(3) Hearings]
    Date Published:November 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Arrest on Rule 5(c)(3)]
    Date Published:November 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Memorandum and Order]
    Date Published:November 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:May 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:May 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Seal Case]
    Date Published:April 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Seal Case]
    Date Published:April 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:[A Docket Text Order with Schedules]
    Date Published:April 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Sentencing Document (by Government)]
    Date Published:February 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Bail Report]
    Date Published:February 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Initial Appearance - Rule 5(c)(3)(magistrate arrest case only)]
    Date Published:February 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:[CJA 20 - Appointment of Attorney]
    Date Published:January 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Order of Detention (non-motion - court's ruling only)]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:[CJA Form 23 - Financial Affidavit]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Arrest]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Letter Lifting Suppression - Information/Superseding Information]
    Date Published:December 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:December 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Letter]
    Date Published:December 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Rule 5 Complaint - Out]
    Date Published:December 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Sealed Document (no service occurs via CM/ECF)]
    Date Published:November 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Sealed Motion (no service occurs via CM/ECF)]
    Date Published:November 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Seizure Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
    Date Published:October 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Order to Unseal Document]
    Date Published:September 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion for Special Appearance]
    Date Published:September 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Special Appearance]
    Date Published:September 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:[~Util - Document Unsealed]
    Date Published:August 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Case Unsealed]
    Date Published:August 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:August 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Order on Application (sealed magistrate case only)]
    Date Published:July 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Application (Sealed Magistrate Case)]
    Date Published:July 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Strike]
    Date Published:July 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Strike]
    Date Published:July 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Redacted Search Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:June 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Leave]
    Date Published:April 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:April 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document]
    Date Published:March 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Seal Document]
    Date Published:March 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Substitute Attorney (Federal Public Defender or Assistant US Attorney)]
    Date Published:March 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Response to Motion]
    Date Published:February 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Response to Court]
    Date Published:February 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:February 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Surreply to Motion (Needs Leave of Court)]
    Date Published:January 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Response in Opposition]
    Date Published:January 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Application and Affidavit for Search Warrant Issued]
    Date Published:January 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Continue]
    Date Published:January 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Order to Unseal Case]
    Date Published:November 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:[~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:October 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:October 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Reply to Response]
    Date Published:October 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:[For Leave to File Sealed Document]
    Date Published:October 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:October 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion for Order (Miscellaneous Relief)]
    Date Published:October 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion for Leave]
    Date Published:September 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:August 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Motion]
    Date Published:August 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:[For Leave to File Sealed Motion]
    Date Published:August 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Entry of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:July 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Extension]
    Date Published:July 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Seal Document]
    Date Published:July 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:June 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:[A Docket Text Order]
    Date Published:June 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Clerk's Order of Reassignment (District Judge or Magistrate)]
    Date Published:April 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Seizure Warrant Issued]
    Date Published:April 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Sealed Order]
    Date Published:March 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Order (rule motion and set or satisfy schedule)]
    Date Published:February 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Seizure Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:February 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Remark]
    Date Published:December 12, 2014
  • Filing Type:[Application and Affidavit for Search Warrant]
    Date Published:December 11, 2014
  • Filing Type:[Search Warrant Issued]
    Date Published:December 11, 2014
  • Filing Type:[Unseal Case]
    Date Published:December 07, 2014
  • Filing Type:[Redacted Application and Affidavit for Search Warrant]
    Date Published:December 04, 2014
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Postpone (Delay) Notification]
    Date Published:December 04, 2014
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
    Date Published:November 26, 2014
  • Filing Type:[Search Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
    Date Published:November 25, 2014
  • Filing Type:[Postpone (Delay) Notification]
    Date Published:November 21, 2014
  • Filing Type:[Sealed Motion]
    Date Published:November 20, 2014
  • Filing Type:[Unseal Document]
    Date Published:November 20, 2014
  • Filing Type:[Seal Application for Search Warrant (MJ cases only)]
    Date Published:November 20, 2014
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
    Date Published:November 18, 2014
  • Filing Type:[Search Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:November 18, 2014
  • Filing Type:[Order on Sealed Motion]
    Date Published:November 18, 2014
  • Filing Type:[Sealed Document]
    Date Published:November 18, 2014
  • Filing Type:[Order on Seal Application for Search Warrant (MJ cases only)]
    Date Published:November 18, 2014
  • Filing Type:[Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:November 18, 2014
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion for Extension]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.moed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?135962
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =