open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:20-cr-00254-1
    Party Name:USA v. Edwards
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
    Date Published:September 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum in Support]
    Date Published:August 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Relief Re: First Step Act]
    Date Published:May 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Compassionate Release]
    Date Published:March 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [BOP Designation]
    Date Published:February 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Reasons (Sealed)]
    Date Published:February 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment Amended]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [For Leave to File Sealed Motion]
    Date Published:January 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Remark]
    Date Published:December 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Document (no service occurs via CM/ECF)]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Dismissal by Government]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Dismiss by Government (indictment/defendant from case)]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [SOR/PersID/Reason for AmdJgm]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Digital Audio File]
    Date Published:November 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Regarding Pretrial Motion Status]
    Date Published:August 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transfer Out]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Acquittal]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Findings of Fact]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Acquittal]
    Date Published:July 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Suppress]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion in Limine]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [In Limine]
    Date Published:May 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:May 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing Cancellation]
    Date Published:May 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [A Docket Text Order with Schedules]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [NextGen Remark]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:May 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Discovery]
    Date Published:May 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond Hearing]
    Date Published:May 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Order Concerning Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:May 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Oral (For Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions by Defendant)]
    Date Published:May 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment Debtor Exam]
    Date Published:April 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:April 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Notice of Dismissal by Government - (MJ cases only)]
    Date Published:April 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Exhibit List]
    Date Published:April 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Rule 5 Papers]
    Date Published:April 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Affidavit]
    Date Published:March 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Continue per 18:3161 - Ends of Justice (Speedy Trial Order)]
    Date Published:March 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:March 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
    Date Published:February 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Clerk's Order of Reassignment (District Judge or Magistrate)]
    Date Published:February 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:February 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ Issued]
    Date Published:February 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Application for Writ]
    Date Published:February 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:October 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:October 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Certiorari]
    Date Published:October 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Competency Hearing]
    Date Published:October 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:October 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Psychiatric Report]
    Date Published:September 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Mandate]
    Date Published:August 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence]
    Date Published:July 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Electronic Transcript (Sealed)]
    Date Published:July 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Judgment and/or Opinion]
    Date Published:May 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reply Suggestions to Motion]
    Date Published:March 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:February 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Minutes (generic set/reset/satisfy schedules only)]
    Date Published:January 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Appointment of Attorney]
    Date Published:January 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSI]
    Date Published:December 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSI]
    Date Published:December 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Mail Returned]
    Date Published:December 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:November 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:November 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:November 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
    Date Published:November 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transfer Out/Probationer]
    Date Published:November 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reduce Sentence]
    Date Published:October 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
    Date Published:October 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter of Transfer In]
    Date Published:October 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
    Date Published:October 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum Opinion]
    Date Published:October 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:October 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Docket Modification]
    Date Published:October 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Terminating Counsel]
    Date Published:September 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transfer Order (ADMIN USE ONLY!)]
    Date Published:August 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:August 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Document (by Government)]
    Date Published:July 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Letter]
    Date Published:July 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:June 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:June 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:June 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Remark ]
    Date Published:May 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Electronic Transcript - Suppression Hearing]
    Date Published:May 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript]
    Date Published:April 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement, Guidelines Rec & Stip Supplement]
    Date Published:April 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement, Guidelines Rec & Stip]
    Date Published:April 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
    Date Published:April 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Electronic Transcript]
    Date Published:March 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
    Date Published:March 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amended Judgment and Commitment]
    Date Published:March 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment and Commitment - Re-Sentencing]
    Date Published:March 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Order]
    Date Published:March 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
    Date Published:March 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transmission of Notice of Appeal Supplement to US Court of Appeals]
    Date Published:March 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
    Date Published:February 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:February 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:February 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Order (Sealed)]
    Date Published:February 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Transferring/Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:February 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion for Order (Sealed)]
    Date Published:February 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Forth Trial Procedures in Criminal Case]
    Date Published:February 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment and Commitment]
    Date Published:February 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver/Withdrawal of Pretrial Motions (SPM)]
    Date Published:February 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum (Sealed)]
    Date Published:February 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
    Date Published:February 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Seal Document]
    Date Published:February 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum]
    Date Published:January 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Probation Form 49 Waiver]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Satisfaction of Judgment (Fine/Costs/Restitution)]
    Date Published:October 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion and Order to dismiss complaint]
    Date Published:October 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Witness List]
    Date Published:October 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond Forfeiture/Revocation Hearing]
    Date Published:October 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Order of Detention]
    Date Published:September 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
    Date Published:September 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request for Discovery]
    Date Published:September 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Oral (For Determination by Court of Admissibility of Arguably Suppressible Evidence)]
    Date Published:September 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Oral (Suppress)]
    Date Published:September 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond]
    Date Published:September 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
    Date Published:August 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [For Leave to File Sealed Document]
    Date Published:August 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for New Trial]
    Date Published:July 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Acceptance to Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:July 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence (2014 Drug Guidelines Amendment 782)]
    Date Published:July 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [New Trial ]
    Date Published:May 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Exhibit Index]
    Date Published:May 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Trial Without Voir Dire]
    Date Published:May 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Verdict]
    Date Published:May 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Instructions Given/Refused]
    Date Published:May 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury List]
    Date Published:May 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Trial With Voir Dire]
    Date Published:May 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proposed Voir Dire]
    Date Published:April 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proposed Jury Instructions]
    Date Published:April 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
    Date Published:April 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Conference]
    Date Published:April 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Filing]
    Date Published:April 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proposed Exhibit List]
    Date Published:April 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proposed Witness List]
    Date Published:April 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Rules of trial]
    Date Published:April 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter]
    Date Published:April 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:March 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [In Court Hearing (Waiver of Motions)]
    Date Published:March 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on motion for order]
    Date Published:March 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:March 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Suppress]
    Date Published:March 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:March 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:February 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:February 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:February 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Substitute Attorney (Federal Public Defender or Assistant US Attorney)]
    Date Published:February 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Discovery Letter]
    Date Published:January 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:January 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Marshal's Return on Judgment]
    Date Published:January 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
    Date Published:January 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum (Order)]
    Date Published:January 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Passport Notice]
    Date Published:January 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order (Financial)]
    Date Published:January 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Reassignment or Recusal]
    Date Published:January 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reduce Sentence (2014 Drug Guidelines Amendment 782)]
    Date Published:December 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment and Commitment-Supervised Release Revocation]
    Date Published:November 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:November 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [A Notice of Compliance with Local Rule 12.07]
    Date Published:November 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:November 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:November 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:November 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Suggestions in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:November 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
    Date Published:October 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Suggestions in Support]
    Date Published:October 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention (non-motion - court's ruling only)]
    Date Published:October 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Search Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:October 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
    Date Published:September 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Evidentiary Hearing]
    Date Published:September 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
    Date Published:September 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
    Date Published:August 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment for Revocation]
    Date Published:August 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Reasons]
    Date Published:August 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Project EARN Sanction Order]
    Date Published:August 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Restitution Questionnaire]
    Date Published:August 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge - Misdemeanor]
    Date Published:August 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing - Guilty]
    Date Published:August 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement, Guidelines Recommendations & Stip]
    Date Published:August 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [A Docket Text Order]
    Date Published:August 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Filing Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:August 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:August 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:July 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
    Date Published:July 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:July 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Examination or Preliminary Hearing]
    Date Published:July 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order (rule motion and set or satisfy schedule)]
    Date Published:July 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment - Redacted]
    Date Published:July 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention and Hearing]
    Date Published:July 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Supervised Release/Probation Revocation Sentencing Computation - FILED UNDER SEAL]
    Date Published:July 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Revocation or Prob/Sup Release or Pretrial Action]
    Date Published:July 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA Form 23 - Financial Affidavit]
    Date Published:July 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Unrestricted Petition for Action on Conditions or Term of Supervision]
    Date Published:July 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:July 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling and Trial Order]
    Date Published:July 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Concerning Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:July 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension]
    Date Published:July 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:July 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension]
    Date Published:July 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:July 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:July 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:July 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Transferring Custody]
    Date Published:July 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bail Report]
    Date Published:July 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:July 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Rule 5]
    Date Published:July 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond Execution]
    Date Published:July 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:July 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:July 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Issued]
    Date Published:June 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Assignment Local Rule 2.08]
    Date Published:June 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Entry of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:June 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
    Date Published:June 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Detain]
    Date Published:June 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Continue Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:June 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Preliminary Hearing]
    Date Published:June 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Complaint]
    Date Published:June 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Affidavit of Financial Status]
    Date Published:June 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Arrest ]
    Date Published:June 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:June 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:[~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:June 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:June 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Continue Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:June 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Order Appointing Counsel Under CJA]
    Date Published:June 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Marshal's Return]
    Date Published:February 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial / Supervised Release]
    Date Published:February 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:January 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment Returned Executed]
    Date Published:December 19, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Transferring Case and Appointing FPD (2014 Drug Guidelines Amendment 782)]
    Date Published:December 10, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reduce Sentence Re: Drug/Chemical Qty Table - Amendment 782]
    Date Published:December 02, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Document]
    Date Published:December 02, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Receipt]
    Date Published:December 01, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.moed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?113753
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =