open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:14-cv-01786
    Party Name:Brown v. Reddy Ice Corporation
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order of Dismissal (case ) or (Stipulation of Dismissal of case)]
    Date Published:June 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:June 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum & Order]
    Date Published:May 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Sealed Motion]
    Date Published:May 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to]
    Date Published:May 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:February 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [ADR Compliance Report]
    Date Published:December 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule)]
    Date Published:November 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Ruling]
    Date Published:November 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:November 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to Complete Mediation]
    Date Published:October 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:September 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Designation of Neutral and ADR Conference Report]
    Date Published:August 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:July 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension]
    Date Published:July 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:July 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:July 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [A Docket Text Order]
    Date Published:July 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney/Firm]
    Date Published:July 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:June 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Entry of Appearance]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.moed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?136187
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =