open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:13-cr-00457-1
    Party Name:USA v. Kirlin et al
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:September 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:June 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:June 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Relief Re: First Step Act]
    Date Published:June 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:June 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [NextGen Remark]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:August 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Request for Termination of Electronic Notification]
    Date Published:August 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:August 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
    Date Published:July 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Judgment]
    Date Published:April 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Opinion from USCA]
    Date Published:April 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Surreply to Motion (Needs Leave of Court)]
    Date Published:April 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response in Opposition]
    Date Published:March 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order (Financial)]
    Date Published:February 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:February 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:December 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Certiorari]
    Date Published:October 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Compel]
    Date Published:September 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Notification from USCA]
    Date Published:August 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [A Docket Text Order]
    Date Published:August 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notification of Appeal and NOA Supplement]
    Date Published:August 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:August 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA Form 23 - Financial Affidavit]
    Date Published:August 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:August 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transfer Out/Probationer]
    Date Published:August 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum and Order]
    Date Published:August 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
    Date Published:May 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Early Termination of Probation]
    Date Published:April 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:April 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transfer Out]
    Date Published:April 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reply to Response]
    Date Published:July 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request]
    Date Published:June 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:June 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:June 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter]
    Date Published:June 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Remark]
    Date Published:May 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:May 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Return of Property/PostTrial]
    Date Published:April 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order (rule motion and set or satisfy schedule)]
    Date Published:April 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:April 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report: Reduction of Sentence Amendment 782 Re: Drug/Chemical Qty Table]
    Date Published:April 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Suggestions in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:April 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:March 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence (2014 Drug Guidelines Amendment 782)]
    Date Published:March 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
    Date Published:February 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Marshal's Return on Judgment]
    Date Published:February 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Receipt]
    Date Published:January 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Pro Se Motion]
    Date Published:January 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Electronic Transcript]
    Date Published:January 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
    Date Published:January 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transmission of Notice of Appeal Supplement to US Court of Appeals]
    Date Published:December 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
    Date Published:December 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Filing]
    Date Published:December 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment and Commitment - Re-Sentencing]
    Date Published:December 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on motion for order]
    Date Published:November 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:November 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:November 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:October 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Marshal's Return]
    Date Published:October 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
    Date Published:September 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Remark ]
    Date Published:August 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Abstract of Judgment]
    Date Published:August 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:August 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Final Order for Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:August 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pro Se Motion]
    Date Published:August 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:July 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Reasons]
    Date Published:July 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [A Notice of Compliance with Local Rule 12.07]
    Date Published:July 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Judgment and/or Opinion]
    Date Published:July 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Mandate]
    Date Published:July 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Document]
    Date Published:July 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:July 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum]
    Date Published:July 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:July 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript]
    Date Published:July 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Acceptance to Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:June 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Clerk's Order of Reassignment (District Judge or Magistrate)]
    Date Published:April 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial / Supervised Release]
    Date Published:March 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reduce Sentence Re: Drug/Chemical Qty Table - Amendment 782]
    Date Published:March 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Transferring Case and Appointing FPD (2014 Drug Guidelines Amendment 782)]
    Date Published:January 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:December 24, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Receipt]
    Date Published:December 01, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Payment Voucher for Attorney Appointment]
    Date Published:November 25, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PostTrial]
    Date Published:November 24, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
    Date Published:November 20, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:November 18, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:November 18, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.moed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?130379
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =