open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:14-cr-00355-1
    Party Name:USA v. Parrish
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum and Order]
    Date Published:April 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter]
    Date Published:March 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reduce Sentence]
    Date Published:January 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ Returned Executed/Unexecuted]
    Date Published:November 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment and Commitment]
    Date Published:October 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:October 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum]
    Date Published:September 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum (Sealed)]
    Date Published:September 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
    Date Published:September 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Seal Document]
    Date Published:September 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:August 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:August 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Receipt]
    Date Published:July 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:March 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:March 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing Cancellation]
    Date Published:February 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
    Date Published:February 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Pretrial conference]
    Date Published:February 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:February 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest ]
    Date Published:January 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:January 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling and Trial Order]
    Date Published:January 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:January 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:January 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:January 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:January 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Affidavit of Financial Status]
    Date Published:January 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:January 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:December 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ Issued]
    Date Published:December 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:December 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:December 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:December 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:December 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:December 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Marshal's Return on Judgment]
    Date Published:July 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Concerning Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.moed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?136481
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =