open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:14-cv-01278
    Party Name:CitiMortgage, Inc. v. Chicago Bancorp, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Case Stayed]
    Date Published:September 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stay]
    Date Published:September 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:September 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:August 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:August 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Limine]
    Date Published:August 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Strike]
    Date Published:July 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Court]
    Date Published:July 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clarify]
    Date Published:June 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:June 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion (SEALED)]
    Date Published:March 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Financial Entry]
    Date Published:March 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Continue]
    Date Published:March 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension]
    Date Published:February 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order (Financial)]
    Date Published:February 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disbursement of Funds]
    Date Published:February 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Mandate]
    Date Published:February 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Order]
    Date Published:February 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement of Material Facts]
    Date Published:February 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Party]
    Date Published:January 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Support of Motion (SEALED)]
    Date Published:January 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:January 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:January 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Court Hearing]
    Date Published:January 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Opposition of Motion (SEALED)]
    Date Published:January 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA JUDGMENT]
    Date Published:December 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Opinion from USCA]
    Date Published:December 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:December 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:December 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Sealed Document]
    Date Published:December 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Exclude]
    Date Published:December 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [For Leave to File Sealed Document]
    Date Published:December 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Sanctions]
    Date Published:November 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:November 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:October 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:August 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to ADR]
    Date Published:August 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:August 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Sealed Motion]
    Date Published:August 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Compel]
    Date Published:August 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:August 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [A Docket Text Order]
    Date Published:August 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [File in Excess of Page Limitation]
    Date Published:August 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Entry of Appearance]
    Date Published:July 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to]
    Date Published:July 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Compel]
    Date Published:July 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:June 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
    Date Published:June 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule)]
    Date Published:June 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:June 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum & Order]
    Date Published:November 19, 2014
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.moed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?134814
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =