open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:14-cr-00091-1
    Party Name:USA v. Goldsberry
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:September 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Relief Re: First Step Act]
    Date Published:September 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [SOR/PersID/Reason for AmdJgm]
    Date Published:May 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment Amended]
    Date Published:May 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request]
    Date Published:May 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Pro Se Motion]
    Date Published:February 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Receipt]
    Date Published:January 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Marshal's Return on Judgment]
    Date Published:September 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Mandate]
    Date Published:June 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Judgment]
    Date Published:April 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Opinion from USCA]
    Date Published:April 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notification of Designated Clerk's Record]
    Date Published:July 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Exhibit Receipt]
    Date Published:December 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Order]
    Date Published:November 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Order Appointing Attorney]
    Date Published:November 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Notification and/or Briefing Schedule from USCA]
    Date Published:November 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notification of Appeal and NOA Supplement]
    Date Published:November 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
    Date Published:November 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Reasons]
    Date Published:November 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:November 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [A Notice of Compliance with Local Rule 12.07]
    Date Published:November 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reply to Response to Objection to Presentence Investigation Report - SEALED]
    Date Published:September 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pro Se Motion]
    Date Published:August 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Exhibits]
    Date Published:July 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Exhibit List]
    Date Published:July 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Witness List]
    Date Published:July 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:July 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:July 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:July 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:May 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:May 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Intent to Call Witnesses at Sentencing]
    Date Published:April 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension]
    Date Published:April 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [A Docket Text Order]
    Date Published:April 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:April 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Acceptance to Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:April 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter]
    Date Published:March 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Document]
    Date Published:February 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Subpoena Returned]
    Date Published:January 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing - Guilty]
    Date Published:January 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
    Date Published:January 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Entry of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:January 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:January 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:January 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Discovery Letter]
    Date Published:December 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Continue per 18:3161 - Ends of Justice (Speedy Trial Order)]
    Date Published:October 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 24 - Transcript Authorization to Pay]
    Date Published:August 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:August 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript]
    Date Published:July 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript (FILED UNDER SEAL)]
    Date Published:July 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:July 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Remark]
    Date Published:July 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript Order Request]
    Date Published:July 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:July 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:July 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order (rule motion and set or satisfy schedule)]
    Date Published:June 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Appointment of Attorney]
    Date Published:June 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:June 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.moed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?132928
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =