open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:14-cr-00250-11
    Party Name:USA v. Kienstra et al
  • Filing Type:Criminal [SOR/PersID/Reason for AmdJgm]
    Date Published:May 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment for Revocation]
    Date Published:May 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
    Date Published:May 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Computation Summary - FILED UNDER SEAL]
    Date Published:May 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention (non-motion - court's ruling only)]
    Date Published:April 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Appointment of Attorney]
    Date Published:April 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Unrestricted Petition for Warrant/Summons - 12C]
    Date Published:April 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
    Date Published:April 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:April 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:April 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Rule 5 Papers]
    Date Published:April 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:April 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reply to Response to Motion (SEALED)]
    Date Published:April 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [ Report: Relief Re: First Step Act]
    Date Published:April 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Relief Re: First Step Act]
    Date Published:April 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Motion (no service occurs via CM/ECF)]
    Date Published:April 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:March 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Supervised Release/Probation Revocation Sentencing Computation - FILED UNDER SEAL]
    Date Published:March 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Minutes (generic set/reset/satisfy schedules only)]
    Date Published:March 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:February 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:February 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response in Opposition]
    Date Published:January 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
    Date Published:January 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Probation Form 49 Waiver]
    Date Published:January 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Satisfaction of Judgment (Fine/Costs/Restitution)]
    Date Published:July 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Vacate]
    Date Published:April 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Motion]
    Date Published:March 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript Order Request]
    Date Published:February 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Final Order for Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:February 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Intent to Call Witnesses at Sentencing]
    Date Published:February 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript - Redacted]
    Date Published:February 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Order]
    Date Published:February 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript (FILED UNDER SEAL)]
    Date Published:January 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [BOP Designation]
    Date Published:January 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Leave]
    Date Published:December 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:December 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter]
    Date Published:November 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Acceptance to Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:October 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [For Leave to File Sealed Document]
    Date Published:October 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [For Leave to File Sealed Motion]
    Date Published:October 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript]
    Date Published:October 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:October 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Passport Notice]
    Date Published:October 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Seal Document]
    Date Published:September 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:August 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Document]
    Date Published:August 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order (Financial)]
    Date Published:August 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [A Notice of Compliance with Local Rule 12.07]
    Date Published:August 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:August 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Marshal's Return]
    Date Published:August 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:August 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Reasons]
    Date Published:August 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:July 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Prelminary Order for Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:July 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
    Date Published:July 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:July 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:July 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report - SEALED]
    Date Published:July 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pre-Trial Brief]
    Date Published:July 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Travel]
    Date Published:July 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Memorandum/Stipulation]
    Date Published:July 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:July 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bail Report]
    Date Published:July 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:July 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:July 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Hearing]
    Date Published:July 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Conference]
    Date Published:July 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Receipt]
    Date Published:June 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Hearing]
    Date Published:June 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Consolidate Cases]
    Date Published:June 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order (rule motion and set or satisfy schedule)]
    Date Published:June 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Payment Voucher for Attorney Appointment]
    Date Published:June 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:June 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Superseding Information]
    Date Published:June 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Indictment]
    Date Published:June 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Entry of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:June 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement, Guidelines Recommendations & Stip - FILED UNDER SEAL]
    Date Published:June 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Re: Sentencing Memorandum]
    Date Published:June 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing - Guilty]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [A Docket Text Order]
    Date Published:January 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:December 15, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:December 15, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension]
    Date Published:December 10, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Filing Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:December 10, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:December 02, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [In Court Hearing (Waiver of Motions)]
    Date Published:November 20, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.moed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?135183
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =