open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:10-cv-00352
    Party Name:Arnold et al v. DirecTV, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order of Dismissal (case ) or (Stipulation of Dismissal of case)]
    Date Published:August 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Sealed Document (no service occurs via CM/ECF)]
    Date Published:August 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Settlement]
    Date Published:August 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document]
    Date Published:August 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [ADR Compliance Report]
    Date Published:July 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appointment of Neutral]
    Date Published:June 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Designation of Neutral and ADR Conference Report]
    Date Published:June 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to ADR]
    Date Published:May 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Scheduling Plan]
    Date Published:May 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to]
    Date Published:December 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum (NON-MOTION EVENT)]
    Date Published:November 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Exhibit Receipt]
    Date Published:October 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure of Organizational Interests]
    Date Published:June 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:May 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report To Court Order]
    Date Published:April 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Lifting Stay]
    Date Published:March 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:March 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:December 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum & Order]
    Date Published:December 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Compel]
    Date Published:December 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:December 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule)]
    Date Published:November 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion (SEALED)]
    Date Published:September 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Statement of Material Facts]
    Date Published:September 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Management Order - Amended]
    Date Published:August 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mail Returned]
    Date Published:August 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion (SEALED)]
    Date Published:August 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Opposition of Motion (SEALED)]
    Date Published:August 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:August 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Seal Document]
    Date Published:August 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:August 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:July 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:June 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:June 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:June 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Partial Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:June 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Support of Motion (SEALED)]
    Date Published:June 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement of Material Facts]
    Date Published:June 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Sealed Document]
    Date Published:June 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certify Class]
    Date Published:June 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:June 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief - Daubert]
    Date Published:June 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [For Leave to File Sealed Motion]
    Date Published:June 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark]
    Date Published:June 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:June 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Lift Stay]
    Date Published:June 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [For Leave to File Sealed Document]
    Date Published:June 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [A Docket Text Order]
    Date Published:June 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [File in Excess of Page Limitation]
    Date Published:June 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:June 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Receipt]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.moed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?105100
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =