open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:16-cr-00301-1
    Party Name:USA v. Carnes
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on motion for order]
    Date Published:May 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Order (Sealed)]
    Date Published:May 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for New Trial]
    Date Published:May 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion for Order (Sealed)]
    Date Published:April 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [New Trial ]
    Date Published:April 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion for Order]
    Date Published:April 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:April 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSI]
    Date Published:March 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSI]
    Date Published:March 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion in Limine]
    Date Published:October 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:October 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:October 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:October 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appear]
    Date Published:October 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Rules of trial]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [In Limine]
    Date Published:October 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Superseding Indictment]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request]
    Date Published:November 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter]
    Date Published:November 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:October 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:September 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:September 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Competency Hearing]
    Date Published:September 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Psychiatric Report]
    Date Published:September 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:September 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Remark ]
    Date Published:May 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam]
    Date Published:May 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Psychiatric Exam]
    Date Published:April 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:January 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Terminating Counsel]
    Date Published:November 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Counsel Under CJA]
    Date Published:November 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:October 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing Cancellation]
    Date Published:August 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Receipt]
    Date Published:April 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Pretrial conference]
    Date Published:April 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling and Trial Order]
    Date Published:October 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:October 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:October 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion and Order to dismiss complaint]
    Date Published:October 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:October 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:September 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:September 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:September 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Preliminary Hearing]
    Date Published:September 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Order of Detention]
    Date Published:September 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:September 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Detain]
    Date Published:September 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Continue Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:September 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:[~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:September 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:September 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Affidavit of Financial Status]
    Date Published:September 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Arrest ]
    Date Published:September 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:September 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Continue Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:September 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Complaint]
    Date Published:September 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Reasons]
    Date Published:January 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:January 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:January 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:November 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:October 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order (rule motion and set or satisfy schedule)]
    Date Published:September 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement, Guidelines Recommendations & Stip]
    Date Published:July 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing - Guilty]
    Date Published:June 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:June 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.moed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?134764
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =