open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:1:03-cr-00086-1
    Party Name:USA v. Null
  • Filing Type:Criminal [NextGen Remark]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment and Commitment]
    Date Published:August 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:August 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum]
    Date Published:July 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSI]
    Date Published:April 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSI]
    Date Published:April 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:November 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:November 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:June 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:June 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:June 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:March 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.moed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?82023
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =