open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:14-cv-01620
    Party Name:Proby v. Russell et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter re:Frap]
    Date Published:August 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment - (Case)]
    Date Published:August 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
    Date Published:August 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Hearing]
    Date Published:July 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Pro Se Motion]
    Date Published:July 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Sanctions]
    Date Published:July 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Court]
    Date Published:July 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pro Se Motion]
    Date Published:July 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:July 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transfer Case]
    Date Published:July 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Sealed Document]
    Date Published:July 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:June 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [For Leave to File Sealed Document]
    Date Published:June 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum & Order]
    Date Published:March 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:March 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reopen Case]
    Date Published:February 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Financial Entry]
    Date Published:February 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Receipt]
    Date Published:January 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:January 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Temporary Restraining Order]
    Date Published:December 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum (NON-MOTION EVENT)]
    Date Published:December 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to]
    Date Published:December 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Hearing]
    Date Published:December 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:December 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
    Date Published:December 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:December 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:December 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Party]
    Date Published:December 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request (NOT TO BE USED AS A MOTION)]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:November 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Exhibits]
    Date Published:November 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing Exhibit]
    Date Published:November 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Seal Document]
    Date Published:November 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:November 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:November 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [File in Excess of Page Limitation]
    Date Published:November 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [A Docket Text Order]
    Date Published:October 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:October 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension]
    Date Published:October 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:September 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule)]
    Date Published:August 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Receipt]
    Date Published:August 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
    Date Published:August 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:August 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.moed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?135701
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =