open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:18-cr-00111-1
    Party Name:USA v. Clayton
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion for Order]
    Date Published:August 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:April 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pro Se Motion]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
    Date Published:October 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:September 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Reasons (Sealed)]
    Date Published:August 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Presentence Investigation Report (Sealed)]
    Date Published:April 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:April 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSI]
    Date Published:March 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSI]
    Date Published:March 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Pretrial conference]
    Date Published:December 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Affidavit of Financial Status]
    Date Published:September 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:July 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Preliminary Hearing]
    Date Published:April 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Order of Detention]
    Date Published:April 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:April 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Detain]
    Date Published:April 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Complaint]
    Date Published:April 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Judgment and/or Opinion]
    Date Published:January 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Electronic Transcript]
    Date Published:August 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:August 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment Returned Executed]
    Date Published:July 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
    Date Published:July 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Order]
    Date Published:July 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
    Date Published:July 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:July 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transmission of Notice of Appeal Supplement to US Court of Appeals]
    Date Published:July 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:July 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
    Date Published:July 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Exhibit Index]
    Date Published:June 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment and Commitment]
    Date Published:June 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Acceptance of Plea and Adjudication of Guilt]
    Date Published:June 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:June 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Plea Entered]
    Date Published:June 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Disclosure]
    Date Published:June 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:May 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum]
    Date Published:April 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
    Date Published:March 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transfer Out]
    Date Published:March 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum and Order]
    Date Published:February 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
    Date Published:November 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:November 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Consent to Entry of Felony Plea Before Magistrate]
    Date Published:November 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:November 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing Cancellation]
    Date Published:November 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proposed Exhibit List]
    Date Published:November 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:November 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proposed Witness List]
    Date Published:October 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proposed Voir Dire]
    Date Published:October 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reduce Sentence re Crack Cocaine Offense - 18:3582]
    Date Published:October 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order (rule motion and set or satisfy schedule)]
    Date Published:October 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Rules of trial]
    Date Published:September 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Mandate]
    Date Published:July 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Judgment]
    Date Published:July 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Opinion from USCA]
    Date Published:July 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Docket Modification]
    Date Published:June 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Conference]
    Date Published:June 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Remark]
    Date Published:June 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:June 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:June 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:June 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter]
    Date Published:June 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response in Opposition]
    Date Published:May 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [A Docket Text Order]
    Date Published:May 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Superseding Indictment]
    Date Published:April 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on motion for order]
    Date Published:March 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:November 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:November 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to File Out of Time]
    Date Published:September 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Marshal's Return]
    Date Published:August 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:August 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:July 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:July 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling and Trial Order]
    Date Published:July 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:July 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:July 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:July 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest ]
    Date Published:July 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:July 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:July 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:July 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:July 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:July 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Transferring Custody]
    Date Published:July 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:June 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Receipt]
    Date Published:June 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report: Reduction of Sentence Amendment 782 Re: Drug/Chemical Qty Table]
    Date Published:February 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reduce Sentence Re: Drug/Chemical Qty Table - Amendment 782]
    Date Published:February 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Payment Voucher for Attorney Appointment]
    Date Published:January 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Prelminary Order for Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:January 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Supervised Release/Probation Revocation Sentencing Computation - FILED UNDER SEAL]
    Date Published:November 18, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:November 18, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.moed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?130827
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =