open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:13-cr-00375-16
    Party Name:USA v. Ceja-Pedrizco et al
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment for Revocation]
    Date Published:August 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
    Date Published:August 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Computation Summary - FILED UNDER SEAL]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Detain]
    Date Published:July 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:July 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
    Date Published:July 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA Form 23 - Financial Affidavit]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention and Hearing]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [NextGen Remark]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
    Date Published:June 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter re:Writ of Certiorari filed w/US Supreme Court]
    Date Published:May 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Records Transmittal]
    Date Published:October 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notification of Designated Clerk's Record]
    Date Published:May 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Order Appointing Attorney]
    Date Published:April 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Notification and/or Briefing Schedule from USCA]
    Date Published:April 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notification of Appeal and NOA Supplement]
    Date Published:April 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
    Date Published:April 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Reasons]
    Date Published:April 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment Amended]
    Date Published:April 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Re-Sentencing]
    Date Published:April 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:March 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:March 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Attorney Withdrawal]
    Date Published:February 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
    Date Published:January 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transfer Out]
    Date Published:January 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Appointment of Attorney]
    Date Published:October 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Resentencing Report]
    Date Published:October 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Court]
    Date Published:September 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Return of Property/PostTrial]
    Date Published:August 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:August 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order (rule motion and set or satisfy schedule)]
    Date Published:July 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request]
    Date Published:July 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Remark]
    Date Published:June 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:June 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter]
    Date Published:June 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:June 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Compel]
    Date Published:May 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Mandate]
    Date Published:November 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Judgment]
    Date Published:October 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Opinion from USCA]
    Date Published:October 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report: Reduction of Sentence Amendment 782 Re: Drug/Chemical Qty Table]
    Date Published:August 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:August 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reduce Sentence Re: Drug/Chemical Qty Table - Amendment 782]
    Date Published:August 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Order]
    Date Published:August 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reduce Sentence]
    Date Published:August 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appeal Transmittal (Sent to USCA or Returned by USCA)]
    Date Published:July 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Receipt]
    Date Published:July 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pro Se Motion]
    Date Published:July 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:July 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript]
    Date Published:June 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript Order Request]
    Date Published:June 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Payment Voucher for Attorney Appointment]
    Date Published:April 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Receipt]
    Date Published:December 17, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Acceptance to Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:December 04, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:December 03, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 21 - Payment Voucher for Expert Services]
    Date Published:December 02, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Marshal's Return on Judgment]
    Date Published:November 26, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [A Docket Text Order]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.moed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?129391
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =