open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:17-cv-01909
    Party Name:Johnson v. Lou Fusz Automotive Network, Inc.
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:April 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule)]
    Date Published:March 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [ADR Compliance Report]
    Date Published:March 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appointment of Neutral]
    Date Published:February 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Designation of Neutral and ADR Conference Report]
    Date Published:February 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to ADR]
    Date Published:February 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Management Order]
    Date Published:November 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:November 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Scheduling Plan]
    Date Published:November 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:November 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum & Order]
    Date Published:October 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 16 Order]
    Date Published:September 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:August 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [A Docket Text Order]
    Date Published:August 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:August 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Strike]
    Date Published:July 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:July 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:July 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure of Organizational Interests]
    Date Published:July 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark]
    Date Published:July 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [CJRA Order]
    Date Published:July 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:July 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Entry of Appearance]
    Date Published:July 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assignment Local Rule 2.08]
    Date Published:July 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Opening Notification]
    Date Published:July 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Process Server]
    Date Published:July 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:July 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [File in Excess of Page Limitation]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.moed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?135999
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =