open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:16-cv-01893
    Party Name:Clark v. Colvin
  • Filing Type:Civil [Social Security Reply Brief]
    Date Published:June 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Social Security Cross Brief (govt only)]
    Date Published:June 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Social Security reply brief by plaintiff]
    Date Published:April 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:April 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Social Security Brief]
    Date Published:March 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [File in Excess of Page Limitation]
    Date Published:March 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transcript of certified administrative hearing]
    Date Published:February 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:February 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:February 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
    Date Published:December 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Full Consent to a Magistrate]
    Date Published:December 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Entry of Appearance]
    Date Published:December 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
    Date Published:December 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Management Order]
    Date Published:December 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule)]
    Date Published:December 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:December 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assignment Local Rule 2.08]
    Date Published:December 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Opening Notification]
    Date Published:December 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Financial Affidavit - CJA 23]
    Date Published:December 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint (Social Security)]
    Date Published:December 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Attorney Fees]
    Date Published:November 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:October 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:September 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Transcript]
    Date Published:September 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Text Entry Only Information]
    Date Published:August 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:July 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:June 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Oral Argument]
    Date Published:November 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued as to USA]
    Date Published:November 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Mandate]
    Date Published:October 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA JUDGMENT]
    Date Published:October 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint - Social Security]
    Date Published:October 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:October 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Social Security brief by defendant]
    Date Published:October 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on motion for extension of Social Security deadlines]
    Date Published:September 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Social Security brief by plaintiff]
    Date Published:September 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:August 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Submission of administrative record]
    Date Published:July 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Social Security complaint]
    Date Published:July 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Receipt]
    Date Published:July 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Notification and/or Briefing Schedule from USCA]
    Date Published:July 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [A Docket Text Order]
    Date Published:July 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney/Firm]
    Date Published:July 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notification of Appeal and NOA Supplement]
    Date Published:July 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appeal]
    Date Published:July 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [ADR Pro Bono Limited Scope Counsel]
    Date Published:July 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Judgment]
    Date Published:July 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:July 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Return of service of Social Security Complaint]
    Date Published:June 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:May 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Magistrate Assignment]
    Date Published:May 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Reassignment Order (NON-CJRA)]
    Date Published:April 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion to extend Social Security Deadlines]
    Date Published:December 29, 2014
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Magistrate Assignment Returned]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?117476
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =