open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:18-cv-00788
    Party Name:Elbert v. City of Kansas City Missouri et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
    Date Published:April 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transmission of Notice of Appeal Supplement to US Court of Appeals]
    Date Published:April 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appeal]
    Date Published:April 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remand Letter Sent]
    Date Published:March 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Judgment]
    Date Published:March 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:March 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:February 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
    Date Published:January 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines]
    Date Published:December 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:December 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:November 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:November 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Designation of Mediator]
    Date Published:November 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:November 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:October 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Suggestions in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:October 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of service of initial Rule 26 disclosures]
    Date Published:October 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:October 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:October 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:October 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Suggestions in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:October 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:October 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing]
    Date Published:October 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 16 Notice]
    Date Published:October 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of MAPN]
    Date Published:October 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
    Date Published:October 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time ]
    Date Published:October 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:October 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Mandate]
    Date Published:October 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Judgment and/or Opinion]
    Date Published:August 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Return of Service of Complaint Executed]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?117883
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =