open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:14-cv-00695
    Party Name:Craft v. Medicredit, Inc.
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Order of Dismissal]
    Date Published:March 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:March 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing Cancellation]
    Date Published:March 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:December 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Stay]
    Date Published:October 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
    Date Published:October 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
    Date Published:October 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Take Deposition]
    Date Published:October 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:September 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing]
    Date Published:September 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:September 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:September 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:September 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 16 Notice]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?116921
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =