open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Missouri
    Case Number:6:14-cv-03277
    Party Name:Storberg v. Colvin
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Judgment]
    Date Published:August 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:August 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:August 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:August 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing Cancellation]
    Date Published:July 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:December 04, 2014
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued as to USA]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?118494
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =