open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Missouri
    Case Number:3:14-cv-05127
    Party Name:Church v. Colvin
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Transcript]
    Date Published:October 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Judgment]
    Date Published:October 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Oral Argument]
    Date Published:October 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:August 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Magistrate Assignment Returned]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?118162
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =