open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:19-cv-02756
    Party Name:Johnson v. USA
  • Filing Type:Civil [Hearing]
    Date Published:July 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Settlement]
    Date Published:July 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:July 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Vacate]
    Date Published:February 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255/Dorsey)]
    Date Published:November 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension]
    Date Published:October 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement]
    Date Published:January 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Judgment]
    Date Published:December 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Receipt]
    Date Published:December 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Notification from USCA]
    Date Published:November 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
    Date Published:November 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
    Date Published:November 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:November 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Preliminary Injunction]
    Date Published:November 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum]
    Date Published:October 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Opinion Memorandum]
    Date Published:August 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Supplement]
    Date Published:August 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
    Date Published:August 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:March 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appeal Remark]
    Date Published:March 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing]
    Date Published:January 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:January 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:December 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:October 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order of Recusal]
    Date Published:September 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [A Docket Text Order with Schedules]
    Date Published:September 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:August 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
    Date Published:July 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
    Date Published:July 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:June 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pro Se Motion]
    Date Published:June 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:June 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:May 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:May 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Supplemental (NON-MOTION EVENT)]
    Date Published:May 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:May 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued as to USA]
    Date Published:May 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:May 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Financial Affidavit]
    Date Published:May 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Financial Affidavit - CJA 23]
    Date Published:May 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:May 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
    Date Published:May 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time ]
    Date Published:May 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to answer]
    Date Published:May 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:April 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
    Date Published:April 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:February 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:January 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Supplement]
    Date Published:November 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:November 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:October 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
    Date Published:August 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA JUDGMENT]
    Date Published:July 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transmission of Notice of Appeal Supplement to US Court of Appeals]
    Date Published:July 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Stay]
    Date Published:July 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:July 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:July 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:July 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark]
    Date Published:June 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Transferring/Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:June 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Writ of Certiorari]
    Date Published:June 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Appealability]
    Date Published:June 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter from USCA]
    Date Published:May 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply Suggestions to Motion]
    Date Published:May 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appeal Transmittal]
    Date Published:April 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order of Dismissal (case ) or (Stipulation of Dismissal of case)]
    Date Published:April 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:April 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment - (Case)]
    Date Published:March 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mail Returned]
    Date Published:March 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:March 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum & Order]
    Date Published:February 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:February 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint Letter Processed (Case Opening Event ONLY)]
    Date Published:February 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint Letter Created (Case Opening Event ONLY)]
    Date Published:February 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order of Dismissal]
    Date Published:February 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
    Date Published:February 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend]
    Date Published:February 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:February 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to Amend]
    Date Published:February 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Appointing FPD (Johnson)]
    Date Published:February 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:February 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stay]
    Date Published:January 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Mandate]
    Date Published:January 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Suggestions in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:January 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:January 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:December 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:December 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:November 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:November 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Judgment and/or Opinion]
    Date Published:November 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:November 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Order]
    Date Published:October 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Notification and/or Briefing Schedule from USCA]
    Date Published:October 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [A Docket Text Order]
    Date Published:October 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:October 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notification of Appeal and NOA Supplement]
    Date Published:October 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appeal]
    Date Published:October 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Management Order]
    Date Published:October 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Case]
    Date Published:October 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum Opinion]
    Date Published:October 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:September 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of MAPADMIN]
    Date Published:September 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:September 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:September 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Entry of Appearance]
    Date Published:September 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Discovery]
    Date Published:July 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:July 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:July 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Discovery]
    Date Published:June 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Compel]
    Date Published:June 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of service of initial Rule 26 disclosures]
    Date Published:June 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Order to Show Cause (42:2255 and 2254 cases only)]
    Date Published:June 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule)]
    Date Published:June 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Opening Notification]
    Date Published:May 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Judgment]
    Date Published:March 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:February 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to]
    Date Published:February 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Docket Modification]
    Date Published:January 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:December 15, 2014
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255/Dorsey)]
    Date Published:December 01, 2014
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Receipt]
    Date Published:November 21, 2014
  • Filing Type:Civil [Evidentiary Hearing]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?107208
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =