open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:15-cv-01624
    Party Name:Henderson v. Colvin
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment - (Case)]
    Date Published:February 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum & Order]
    Date Published:February 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:January 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
    Date Published:January 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time ]
    Date Published:January 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:August 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Return of service of Social Security Complaint]
    Date Published:June 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:May 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint - Social Security]
    Date Published:May 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:May 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Social Security Reply Brief]
    Date Published:April 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Social Security Cross Brief (govt only)]
    Date Published:April 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [A Docket Text Order]
    Date Published:March 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:March 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Social Security reply brief by plaintiff]
    Date Published:February 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:February 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Social Security Brief]
    Date Published:February 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Social Security brief by defendant]
    Date Published:January 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transcript of certified administrative hearing]
    Date Published:January 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:January 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:December 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
    Date Published:November 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Full Consent to a Magistrate]
    Date Published:November 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Entry of Appearance]
    Date Published:November 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Social Security brief by plaintiff]
    Date Published:November 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued as to USA]
    Date Published:October 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Management Order]
    Date Published:October 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule)]
    Date Published:October 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assignment Local Rule 2.08]
    Date Published:October 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Opening Notification]
    Date Published:October 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Financial Affidavit - CJA 23]
    Date Published:October 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:October 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint (Social Security)]
    Date Published:October 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Judgment]
    Date Published:September 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on motion for extension of Social Security deadlines]
    Date Published:August 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion to extend Social Security Deadlines]
    Date Published:August 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Social Security complaint]
    Date Published:June 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Submission of administrative record]
    Date Published:June 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Magistrate Assignment]
    Date Published:March 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Magistrate Assignment Returned]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?116807
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =