open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:1:18-cr-00166-1
    Party Name:USA v. Mays
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amendment/Supplemental Pleading]
    Date Published:July 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:June 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Attorney Withdrawal]
    Date Published:June 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Motion (no service occurs via CM/ECF)]
    Date Published:June 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Hearing]
    Date Published:June 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Relief Re: First Step Act]
    Date Published:May 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:May 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:April 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:March 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond Hearing]
    Date Published:March 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Digital Audio File]
    Date Published:March 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Document (no service occurs via CM/ECF)]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [SOR/PersID/Reason for AmdJgm]
    Date Published:January 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Receipt]
    Date Published:January 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Continue per 18:3161 - Ends of Justice (Speedy Trial Order)]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Forth Trial Procedures in Criminal Case]
    Date Published:September 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request for Continued Detention]
    Date Published:June 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Court]
    Date Published:June 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Superseding Indictment - Redacted]
    Date Published:June 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Superseding Indictment]
    Date Published:June 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Marshal's Return on Judgment]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Disclosure]
    Date Published:June 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Dismiss Indictment/Counts]
    Date Published:June 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Suppress]
    Date Published:June 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum in Support]
    Date Published:June 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bill of Particulars]
    Date Published:June 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [NextGen Remark]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [A Notice of Compliance with Local Rule 12.07]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Reasons]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:April 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Letter]
    Date Published:April 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
    Date Published:April 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Leave]
    Date Published:April 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Conference]
    Date Published:April 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Case No Longer Referred]
    Date Published:April 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Document (by Government)]
    Date Published:April 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Acceptance to Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension]
    Date Published:February 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [A Docket Text Order with Schedules]
    Date Published:January 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement, Guidelines Rec & Stip Supplement]
    Date Published:January 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement, Guidelines Rec & Stip]
    Date Published:January 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention (non-motion - court's ruling only)]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:January 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order (rule motion and set or satisfy schedule)]
    Date Published:December 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:December 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Appointment of Attorney]
    Date Published:December 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Discovery Letter]
    Date Published:December 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Disclosure of Arguably Suppressible Evidence]
    Date Published:December 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
    Date Published:December 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Clerk's Order of Reassignment (District Judge or Magistrate)]
    Date Published:December 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Regarding Pretrial Motion Status]
    Date Published:December 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Rule 5 Papers]
    Date Published:December 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Filing Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:December 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
    Date Published:December 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum (Order)]
    Date Published:December 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Discovery]
    Date Published:November 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Order Concerning Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:November 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Oral (For Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions by Defendant)]
    Date Published:November 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention and Hearing]
    Date Published:November 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment - Redacted]
    Date Published:November 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:October 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:October 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Concerning Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:September 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension]
    Date Published:September 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge - Misdemeanor]
    Date Published:September 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [A Docket Text Order]
    Date Published:September 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Remark]
    Date Published:September 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:September 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:August 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request for Discovery]
    Date Published:August 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond]
    Date Published:August 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA Form 23 - Financial Affidavit]
    Date Published:August 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:August 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Rule 5]
    Date Published:August 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond Execution]
    Date Published:August 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:August 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Assignment Local Rule 2.08]
    Date Published:July 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Issued]
    Date Published:July 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Entry of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:July 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
    Date Published:July 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Acceptance of Plea and Adjudication of Guilt]
    Date Published:June 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice Regarding Entry of a Plea of Guilty]
    Date Published:May 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:February 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amended Judgment and Commitment]
    Date Published:October 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
    Date Published:September 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Counsel Under CJA]
    Date Published:August 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Electronic Transcript]
    Date Published:August 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSI]
    Date Published:July 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment and Commitment]
    Date Published:June 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:June 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSI]
    Date Published:June 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum]
    Date Published:June 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:May 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
    Date Published:April 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:February 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:February 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:January 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing Cancellation]
    Date Published:January 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Pretrial conference]
    Date Published:January 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:December 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:November 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Transferring/Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:October 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:October 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:October 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Preliminary Hearing]
    Date Published:October 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:October 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:October 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Remark Sealing/Unsealing Indictment]
    Date Published:September 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling and Trial Order]
    Date Published:September 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial / Supervised Release]
    Date Published:September 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:September 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:August 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:August 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Order of Detention]
    Date Published:August 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Arrest ]
    Date Published:August 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Continue Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:August 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:August 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Detain]
    Date Published:August 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:[~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:August 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Affidavit of Financial Status]
    Date Published:August 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:August 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:August 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Notice of Docket Modification]
    Date Published:August 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Complaint]
    Date Published:August 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:August 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Continue Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:August 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Probation Form 49 Waiver]
    Date Published:March 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Modifying Conditions of Supervised Release]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?103967
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =