open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:14-cv-01848
    Party Name:Hamilton v. Colvin
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment - (Case)]
    Date Published:March 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum & Order]
    Date Published:March 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Social Security Cross Brief (govt only)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Social Security Brief]
    Date Published:January 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [A Docket Text Order]
    Date Published:January 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [File in Excess of Page Limitation]
    Date Published:January 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:January 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines]
    Date Published:November 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Judgment]
    Date Published:November 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Transcript]
    Date Published:November 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Oral Argument]
    Date Published:October 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Transferring/Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:October 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Docket Modification]
    Date Published:October 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Continue]
    Date Published:September 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:September 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Social Security reply brief by plaintiff]
    Date Published:August 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Social Security brief by plaintiff]
    Date Published:August 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Return of service of Social Security Complaint]
    Date Published:July 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on motion for extension of Social Security deadlines]
    Date Published:July 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion to extend Social Security Deadlines]
    Date Published:July 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
    Date Published:July 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:July 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time ]
    Date Published:July 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Social Security brief by defendant]
    Date Published:July 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Submission of administrative record]
    Date Published:July 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Social Security complaint]
    Date Published:July 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:April 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:March 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
    Date Published:November 21, 2014
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Magistrate Assignment Returned]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?117516
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =