open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:16-cv-00296
    Party Name:Moore et al v. Colvin
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:June 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:May 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Mandate]
    Date Published:March 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Order]
    Date Published:February 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Remand]
    Date Published:February 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remand]
    Date Published:January 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
    Date Published:January 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:January 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA JUDGMENT]
    Date Published:December 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Opinion from USCA]
    Date Published:December 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter of reassignment]
    Date Published:October 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time ]
    Date Published:October 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Social Security Reply Brief]
    Date Published:August 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Social Security brief by defendant]
    Date Published:July 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:June 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mail Returned]
    Date Published:May 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:May 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint Letter Processed (Case Opening Event ONLY)]
    Date Published:May 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transcript of certified administrative hearing]
    Date Published:April 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:April 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:April 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Attorney Fees]
    Date Published:March 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Court Hearing]
    Date Published:March 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint Letter Created (Case Opening Event ONLY)]
    Date Published:March 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Financial Affidavit - CJA 23]
    Date Published:March 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Receipt]
    Date Published:March 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension]
    Date Published:March 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report To Court Order]
    Date Published:March 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Notification and/or Briefing Schedule from USCA]
    Date Published:March 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney/Firm]
    Date Published:February 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notification of Appeal and NOA Supplement]
    Date Published:February 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appeal]
    Date Published:February 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Social Security brief by plaintiff]
    Date Published:February 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Full Consent to a Magistrate]
    Date Published:February 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
    Date Published:February 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum Opinion]
    Date Published:February 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Management Order]
    Date Published:February 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assignment Local Rule 2.08]
    Date Published:February 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Opening Notification]
    Date Published:February 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint (Social Security)]
    Date Published:February 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:January 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:January 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on motion for extension of Social Security deadlines]
    Date Published:October 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Social Security Brief]
    Date Published:October 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Submission of administrative record]
    Date Published:September 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Social Security complaint]
    Date Published:September 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement of Material Facts]
    Date Published:August 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [A Docket Text Order]
    Date Published:August 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum & Order]
    Date Published:August 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment - (Case)]
    Date Published:August 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:August 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule)]
    Date Published:August 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:July 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Magistrate Assignment Returned]
    Date Published:July 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Return of service of Social Security Complaint]
    Date Published:July 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Appointing Attorney]
    Date Published:July 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Entry of Appearance]
    Date Published:July 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Record Transmittal]
    Date Published:July 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Social Security Cross Brief (govt only)]
    Date Published:June 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued as to USA]
    Date Published:June 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint - Social Security]
    Date Published:June 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:June 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:June 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Magistrate Assignment]
    Date Published:June 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark]
    Date Published:February 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appointment of Next Friend]
    Date Published:January 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [File in Excess of Page Limitation]
    Date Published:December 04, 2014
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:November 28, 2014
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Judgment]
    Date Published:November 21, 2014
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion to extend Social Security Deadlines]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?116217
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =