open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Missouri
    Case Number:6:12-cv-05075
    Party Name:Stewart v. Wagner et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order of Dismissal]
    Date Published:October 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:October 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:September 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:August 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:August 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Suggestions in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:July 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:July 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [File Excess Pages]
    Date Published:July 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Compel]
    Date Published:July 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:June 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:June 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Compel]
    Date Published:June 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Quash]
    Date Published:May 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Quash]
    Date Published:May 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:February 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Take Deposition]
    Date Published:February 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Designation]
    Date Published:November 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:November 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing]
    Date Published:November 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:October 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:October 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Mandate]
    Date Published:October 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Judgment and/or Opinion]
    Date Published:September 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
    Date Published:June 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transmission of Notice of Appeal Supplement to US Court of Appeals]
    Date Published:June 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Stay]
    Date Published:June 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:June 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appeal]
    Date Published:June 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stay]
    Date Published:June 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:June 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Take Deposition]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?105276
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =