open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Missouri
    Case Number:6:07-cv-03089
    Party Name:USA v. Yazzie
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:May 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mail Returned]
    Date Published:May 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Mandate]
    Date Published:January 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Judgment and/or Opinion]
    Date Published:January 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:December 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Order]
    Date Published:December 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
    Date Published:December 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transmission of Notice of Appeal Supplement to US Court of Appeals]
    Date Published:November 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:November 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appeal]
    Date Published:November 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:November 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations (Sealed)]
    Date Published:November 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:November 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report and Recommendations (Sealed)]
    Date Published:October 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Suggestions in Opposition to Motion (Sealed)]
    Date Published:October 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing]
    Date Published:September 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Hearing]
    Date Published:August 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Sealed)]
    Date Published:October 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Sealed Motion]
    Date Published:July 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion for Order (Sealed)]
    Date Published:June 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report (Sealed)]
    Date Published:June 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Petition for Mental Status (Sealed)]
    Date Published:May 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?81145
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =