open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:12-cv-00876
    Party Name:Donegan v. Anesthesia Associates of Kansas City, PC
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Mandate]
    Date Published:October 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Judgment and/or Opinion]
    Date Published:August 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Judgment]
    Date Published:July 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
    Date Published:July 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Docket Modification]
    Date Published:July 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply Suggestions to Motion]
    Date Published:July 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objections to bill of costs]
    Date Published:July 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Suggestions in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:July 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Bill of Costs]
    Date Published:June 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
    Date Published:June 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appeal]
    Date Published:June 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transmission of Notice of Appeal Supplement to US Court of Appeals]
    Date Published:June 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Attorney Fees]
    Date Published:June 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Suggestions in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:June 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?104944
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =