open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:13-cr-00191-1
    Party Name:USA v. Francis
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
    Date Published:September 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Compassionate Release]
    Date Published:August 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence (FIRST STEP Act of 2018)]
    Date Published:April 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment and Commitment-Supervised Release Revocation]
    Date Published:March 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revoke]
    Date Published:February 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Terminating Counsel]
    Date Published:February 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:February 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Receipt]
    Date Published:December 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Retroactive Application of Sentencing Guidelines re: Drug/Chemical Qty Table]
    Date Published:December 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence]
    Date Published:December 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:December 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Reasons (Sealed)]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment and Commitment]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSI]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSI]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on motion for order]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:May 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:May 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amendment/Supplemental Pleading]
    Date Published:March 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Transferring Case and Appointing FPD (FIRST STEP Act of 2018)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reduce Sentence (FIRST STEP Act of 2018)]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
    Date Published:January 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Early Termination of Probation]
    Date Published:December 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
    Date Published:December 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Affidavit of Financial Status]
    Date Published:December 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling and Trial Order]
    Date Published:November 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:November 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:October 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:October 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:October 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:October 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Electronic Transcript]
    Date Published:September 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:September 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Competency Hearing]
    Date Published:September 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Psychiatric Report]
    Date Published:August 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Suggestions in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:July 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Filing]
    Date Published:July 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:July 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Transferring/Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:July 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:July 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pro Se Motion]
    Date Published:June 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing Cancellation]
    Date Published:May 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Order of Competency to Stand Trial]
    Date Published:March 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:March 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Competency to Stand Trial]
    Date Published:February 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:December 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reduce Sentence]
    Date Published:December 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transfer Order (ADMIN USE ONLY!)]
    Date Published:August 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial / Supervised Release]
    Date Published:August 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:June 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:May 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:May 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:May 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:May 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:May 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:May 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:May 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest ]
    Date Published:May 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:May 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:May 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
    Date Published:March 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transfer Out]
    Date Published:March 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response in Opposition]
    Date Published:February 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reduce Sentence re Crack Cocaine Offense - 18:3582]
    Date Published:February 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:December 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
    Date Published:September 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence (2014 Drug Guidelines Amendment 782)]
    Date Published:July 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Notice of Dismissal by Government - (MJ cases only)]
    Date Published:April 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Order (rule motion and set or satisfy schedule)]
    Date Published:April 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:March 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Continue]
    Date Published:March 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter]
    Date Published:February 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:February 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:February 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
    Date Published:January 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Bail Report]
    Date Published:January 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Extension of Time to Indict]
    Date Published:January 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Bond Execution]
    Date Published:January 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Initial Appearance - Rule 5(c)(3)(magistrate arrest case only)]
    Date Published:January 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Detain]
    Date Published:January 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:[~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:January 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:January 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Clerk's Order of Reassignment (District Judge or Magistrate)]
    Date Published:January 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Bond]
    Date Published:January 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:January 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:[CJA Form 23 - Financial Affidavit]
    Date Published:January 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Arrest]
    Date Published:January 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
    Date Published:January 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Warrant Issued]
    Date Published:December 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Detention and Hearing]
    Date Published:December 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Entry of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:December 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Complaint]
    Date Published:December 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Affidavit]
    Date Published:December 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Transferring Case and Appointing FPD (2014 Drug Guidelines Amendment 782)]
    Date Published:July 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [A Docket Text Order]
    Date Published:July 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:July 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reduce Sentence (2014 Drug Guidelines Amendment 782)]
    Date Published:May 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Probation Form 49 Waiver]
    Date Published:December 11, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reduce Sentence Re: Drug/Chemical Qty Table - Amendment 782]
    Date Published:December 08, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report: Reduction of Sentence Amendment 782 Re: Drug/Chemical Qty Table]
    Date Published:December 04, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?109484
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =