open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:20-mj-01071-1
    Party Name:USA v. Pearson
  • Filing Type:[Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
    Date Published:June 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [SOR/PersID/Reason for AmdJgm]
    Date Published:May 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
    Date Published:May 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [For Leave to File Sealed Document]
    Date Published:May 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver]
    Date Published:May 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion for Order]
    Date Published:April 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [ Report: Relief Re: First Step Act]
    Date Published:April 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript]
    Date Published:April 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Relief Re: First Step Act]
    Date Published:March 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:December 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:December 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Discovery]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Order Concerning Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request for Discovery]
    Date Published:October 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Oral (For Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions by Defendant)]
    Date Published:October 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Commitment to Another District]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Hearing]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Passport Notice]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Receipt]
    Date Published:September 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Sealed Document (no service occurs via CM/ECF)]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Bond Hearing]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Rule 5 Papers]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Arrest on Rule 5(c)(3)]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Rule 5 Complaint - Out]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Remark]
    Date Published:June 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:June 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [NextGen Remark]
    Date Published:May 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [A Notice of Compliance with Local Rule 12.07]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Reasons]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Document (by Government)]
    Date Published:January 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Mandate]
    Date Published:December 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:December 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Acceptance to Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:December 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [A Docket Text Order]
    Date Published:December 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Judgment and/or Opinion]
    Date Published:December 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:September 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement, Guidelines Rec & Stip Supplement]
    Date Published:September 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement, Guidelines Rec & Stip]
    Date Published:September 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing - Guilty]
    Date Published:September 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order (rule motion and set or satisfy schedule)]
    Date Published:September 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Continue per 18:3161 - Ends of Justice (Speedy Trial Order)]
    Date Published:August 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Forth Trial Procedures in Criminal Case]
    Date Published:August 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Regarding Pretrial Motion Status]
    Date Published:July 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Filing Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:July 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:July 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Suppress]
    Date Published:July 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Disclosure of Arguably Suppressible Evidence]
    Date Published:June 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Discovery Letter]
    Date Published:June 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Electronic Transcript (Sealed)]
    Date Published:March 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Order]
    Date Published:March 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Concerning Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:March 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Oral (For Determination by Court of Admissibility of Arguably Suppressible Evidence)]
    Date Published:March 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension]
    Date Published:March 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Oral (Suppress)]
    Date Published:March 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reply to Sentencing Memorandum (Sealed)]
    Date Published:March 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:March 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Detain]
    Date Published:February 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bail Report]
    Date Published:February 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Rule 5]
    Date Published:February 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum (Order)]
    Date Published:February 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
    Date Published:February 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Entry of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:January 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention and Hearing]
    Date Published:January 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Assignment Local Rule 2.08]
    Date Published:January 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Issued]
    Date Published:January 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment - Redacted]
    Date Published:January 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Acceptance of Plea and Adjudication of Guilt]
    Date Published:October 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice Regarding Entry of a Plea of Guilty]
    Date Published:October 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
    Date Published:October 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:October 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment Returned Executed]
    Date Published:June 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:May 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:May 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Superseding Indictment]
    Date Published:May 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Bond]
    Date Published:May 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond]
    Date Published:May 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
    Date Published:May 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
    Date Published:March 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Electronic Transcript]
    Date Published:March 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
    Date Published:March 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
    Date Published:March 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amended Judgment and Commitment]
    Date Published:February 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transmission of Notice of Appeal Supplement to US Court of Appeals]
    Date Published:February 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
    Date Published:February 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment and Commitment]
    Date Published:February 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:February 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum (Sealed)]
    Date Published:February 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum]
    Date Published:February 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for New Trial]
    Date Published:February 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:January 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling and Trial Order]
    Date Published:January 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:January 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:January 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:January 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:January 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:[~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:January 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:January 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Complaint]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSI]
    Date Published:January 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSI]
    Date Published:January 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:December 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:December 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [New Trial ]
    Date Published:November 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Return of Service (generic)]
    Date Published:October 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Verdict]
    Date Published:October 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Instructions Given/Refused]
    Date Published:October 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Exhibit Index]
    Date Published:October 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury List]
    Date Published:October 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Acquittal]
    Date Published:October 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on motion for order]
    Date Published:October 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Trial Without Voir Dire]
    Date Published:October 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Trial With Voir Dire]
    Date Published:October 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Transferring/Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:October 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
    Date Published:October 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum Opinion]
    Date Published:October 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proposed Jury Instructions]
    Date Published:October 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter]
    Date Published:October 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [In Limine]
    Date Published:October 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proposed Voir Dire]
    Date Published:October 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reply Suggestions to Motion]
    Date Published:October 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sever Defendant]
    Date Published:September 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to File Out of Time]
    Date Published:September 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proposed Exhibit List]
    Date Published:September 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:September 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Suggestions in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:September 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [File Out of Time]
    Date Published:September 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Counsel Under CJA]
    Date Published:May 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Terminating Counsel]
    Date Published:May 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:May 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Conference]
    Date Published:May 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
    Date Published:May 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proposed Witness List]
    Date Published:May 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Remark ]
    Date Published:May 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment and Commitment-Supervised Release Revocation]
    Date Published:February 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
    Date Published:February 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:January 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
    Date Published:January 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Affidavit of Financial Status]
    Date Published:January 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
    Date Published:January 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
    Date Published:January 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:December 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA Form 23 - Financial Affidavit]
    Date Published:December 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Unrestricted Petition for Action on Conditions or Term of Supervision]
    Date Published:December 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Revocation or Prob/Sup Release or Pretrial Action]
    Date Published:December 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:December 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Retroactive App.of Sentencing Guidelines re: Drug/Chemical Qty Tbl - Non-Disclosure]
    Date Published:November 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment Amended(AO247): Order Regarding Reduction of Sentence Amendment 782]
    Date Published:November 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:October 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amendment/Supplemental Pleading]
    Date Published:October 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:September 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:August 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing Cancellation]
    Date Published:August 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:July 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Pretrial conference]
    Date Published:July 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report: Reduction of Sentence Amendment 782 Re: Drug/Chemical Qty Table]
    Date Published:July 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reduce Sentence Re: Drug/Chemical Qty Table - Amendment 782]
    Date Published:July 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial / Supervised Release]
    Date Published:March 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:February 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:January 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?118407
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =