open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:14-cv-00789
    Party Name:Consumer Financial Protection Bureau v. Moseley et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:March 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [File Excess Pages]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:January 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:January 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:November 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Ex Parte Order on Ex Parte Motion]
    Date Published:November 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rules of trial]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Lift Stay]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
    Date Published:May 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Seal Document]
    Date Published:May 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply Suggestions to Motion]
    Date Published:May 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:April 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:April 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Lift Stay]
    Date Published:March 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order of Dismissal]
    Date Published:August 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Consent Judgment]
    Date Published:July 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
    Date Published:July 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Docket Modification]
    Date Published:July 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time ]
    Date Published:July 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent Judgment]
    Date Published:July 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:July 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:July 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:July 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Transferring/Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:June 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:October 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:October 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:October 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:June 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Suggestions in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:March 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion for Order (Sealed)]
    Date Published:March 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Stay]
    Date Published:March 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stay]
    Date Published:March 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report (Sealed)]
    Date Published:February 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:February 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing]
    Date Published:February 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:February 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:January 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:January 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:January 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of service of initial Rule 26 disclosures]
    Date Published:January 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:January 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Demand]
    Date Published:January 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Hearing]
    Date Published:November 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Sealed Motion]
    Date Published:November 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Join]
    Date Published:November 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:November 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
    Date Published:November 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Suggestions in Opposition to Motion (Sealed)]
    Date Published:November 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Suggestions in Support of Motion (Sealed)]
    Date Published:October 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
    Date Published:October 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of MAPADMIN]
    Date Published:October 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:October 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Compel]
    Date Published:October 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:July 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Compel]
    Date Published:June 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply Suggestions to Motion (Sealed)]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?117426
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =