open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Missouri
    Case Number:2:19-cr-04068-1
    Party Name:USA v. Irvin
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Detain]
    Date Published:January 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:January 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling and Trial Order]
    Date Published:January 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:December 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:October 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Continue Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:October 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:December 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:July 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:June 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Mandate]
    Date Published:August 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial / Supervised Release]
    Date Published:June 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Judgment and/or Opinion]
    Date Published:June 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
    Date Published:December 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
    Date Published:August 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transmission of Notice of Appeal Supplement to US Court of Appeals]
    Date Published:July 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:July 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Subsequent Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
    Date Published:July 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:July 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
    Date Published:July 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment and Commitment]
    Date Published:July 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:July 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proposed Witness List]
    Date Published:July 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum]
    Date Published:June 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Early Termination of Probation]
    Date Published:June 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:January 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Electronic Transcript]
    Date Published:November 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Transferring/Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:October 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing Cancellation]
    Date Published:October 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:October 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Pretrial conference]
    Date Published:October 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:September 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:September 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proposed Exhibit List]
    Date Published:July 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Suggestions in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:July 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Evidentiary Hearing]
    Date Published:July 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:July 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment Debtor Exam]
    Date Published:March 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:February 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [A Docket Text Order]
    Date Published:December 02, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Filing]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?114697
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =