open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Missouri
    Case Number:2:14-cr-04067-1
    Party Name:USA v. Strobel
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Filing]
    Date Published:October 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment and Commitment]
    Date Published:August 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Acceptance of Plea and Adjudication of Guilt]
    Date Published:August 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:August 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:August 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum]
    Date Published:August 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:May 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Consent to Entry of Felony Plea Before Magistrate]
    Date Published:April 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:April 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
    Date Published:April 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:April 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Conference]
    Date Published:August 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:August 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:July 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:July 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?118580
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =