open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:16-cr-00323-1
    Party Name:USA v. Cooper et al
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
    Date Published:August 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [SRC COVID-19 Remark]
    Date Published:July 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Marshal's Return]
    Date Published:July 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:July 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:July 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Motion (SEALED)]
    Date Published:July 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Final Order for Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:July 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Compassionate Release]
    Date Published:July 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [ Report: Relief Re: First Step Act]
    Date Published:June 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:June 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:June 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:June 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Mail Returned]
    Date Published:April 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:March 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Computation Summary - FILED UNDER SEAL]
    Date Published:February 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:January 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:[Digital Audio File]
    Date Published:January 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver]
    Date Published:January 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
    Date Published:January 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Unrestricted Petition for Warrant/Summons - 12C]
    Date Published:January 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:[Oral]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Reasons (Sealed)]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [SOR/PersID/Reason for AmdJgm]
    Date Published:January 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Prelminary Order for Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Relief Re: First Step Act]
    Date Published:October 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Frye Hearing]
    Date Published:July 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Motion (no service occurs via CM/ECF)]
    Date Published:June 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pro Se Motion]
    Date Published:May 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [NextGen Remark]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Document (no service occurs via CM/ECF)]
    Date Published:May 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Attorney Withdrawal]
    Date Published:May 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension]
    Date Published:May 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:May 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on motion for order]
    Date Published:April 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Pretrial conference]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Rule 5 Papers]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing / Re-Sentencing]
    Date Published:April 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:April 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Order Concerning Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:March 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Disclosure]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ Issued]
    Date Published:March 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:March 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:March 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing Cancellation]
    Date Published:February 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Regarding Pretrial Motion Status]
    Date Published:January 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [BOP Designation]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum and Order]
    Date Published:January 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request]
    Date Published:January 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:December 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Exhibits]
    Date Published:December 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Witness List]
    Date Published:December 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Exhibit List]
    Date Published:December 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:December 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Acceptance of Plea and Adjudication of Guilt]
    Date Published:December 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment Amended]
    Date Published:December 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bill of Particulars]
    Date Published:December 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:November 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Protective Order]
    Date Published:November 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:October 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:October 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Attorney Substitution]
    Date Published:September 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transfer Order (ADMIN USE ONLY!)]
    Date Published:September 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request for Continued Detention]
    Date Published:August 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
    Date Published:August 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:August 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Affidavit]
    Date Published:August 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Show Cause Hearing]
    Date Published:July 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Case No Longer Referred]
    Date Published:June 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proposed Witness List]
    Date Published:May 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amended Judgment and Commitment]
    Date Published:May 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment and Plea of Guilty]
    Date Published:May 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Superseding Information]
    Date Published:May 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Regarding Waiver (Post Hearing)]
    Date Published:April 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:April 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:April 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice Regarding Entry of a Plea of Guilty]
    Date Published:February 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:February 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Information - Felony]
    Date Published:February 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Indictment]
    Date Published:February 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Unseal Case]
    Date Published:February 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Letter]
    Date Published:January 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:January 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Order (Sealed)]
    Date Published:January 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Marshal's Return on Judgment]
    Date Published:January 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion for Order (Sealed)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
    Date Published:January 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Oral (Suppress)]
    Date Published:January 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Oral (For Determination by Court of Admissibility of Arguably Suppressible Evidence)]
    Date Published:January 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:January 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [A Docket Text Order with Schedules]
    Date Published:December 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Document (by Government)]
    Date Published:November 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
    Date Published:October 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [For Leave to File Sealed Document]
    Date Published:October 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Restitution Questionnaire]
    Date Published:October 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Clerk's Order of Reassignment (District Judge or Magistrate)]
    Date Published:August 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond]
    Date Published:August 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond Execution]
    Date Published:August 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:August 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter]
    Date Published:August 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSI]
    Date Published:August 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSI]
    Date Published:August 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement, Guidelines Rec & Stip]
    Date Published:August 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement, Guidelines Rec & Stip Supplement]
    Date Published:August 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Determination of Admissibility]
    Date Published:July 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
    Date Published:June 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Continue per 18:3161 - Ends of Justice (Speedy Trial Order)]
    Date Published:May 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
    Date Published:May 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Commitment to Another District]
    Date Published:May 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Removal/Identity Hearing]
    Date Published:May 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Rule 5]
    Date Published:May 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:May 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:April 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:April 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:March 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:March 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:March 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Substitute Attorney (Federal Public Defender or Assistant US Attorney)]
    Date Published:March 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:March 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:February 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Appointment of Attorney]
    Date Published:February 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Leave]
    Date Published:February 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension]
    Date Published:February 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Custody Directives and Order Transferring Custody]
    Date Published:January 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Oral (For Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions by Defendant)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Disclosure of Arguably Suppressible Evidence]
    Date Published:January 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request for Discovery]
    Date Published:January 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:January 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:January 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Superseding Indictment]
    Date Published:December 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion and Order to dismiss complaint]
    Date Published:October 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Order of Detention]
    Date Published:October 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention and Hearing]
    Date Published:October 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Entry of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:October 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Preliminary Hearing]
    Date Published:October 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Issued]
    Date Published:October 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment - Redacted]
    Date Published:October 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:October 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Order Appointing Counsel Under CJA]
    Date Published:September 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Detain]
    Date Published:September 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Continue Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:September 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Continue Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:September 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Complaint]
    Date Published:September 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Electronic Transcript]
    Date Published:August 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
    Date Published:August 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:August 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Receipt]
    Date Published:July 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [A Notice of Compliance with Local Rule 12.07]
    Date Published:July 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Reasons]
    Date Published:July 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:July 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:July 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Acceptance to Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:July 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
    Date Published:July 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest ]
    Date Published:June 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:June 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement, Guidelines Recommendations & Stip]
    Date Published:April 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing - Guilty]
    Date Published:April 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Minutes (generic set/reset/satisfy schedules only)]
    Date Published:April 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Forth Trial Procedures in Criminal Case]
    Date Published:April 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver/Withdrawal of Pretrial Motions (SPM)]
    Date Published:March 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [In Court Hearing (Waiver of Motions)]
    Date Published:March 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:March 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Filing Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:March 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [A Docket Text Order]
    Date Published:March 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:March 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:March 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment Returned Executed]
    Date Published:February 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Concerning Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:February 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:February 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order (rule motion and set or satisfy schedule)]
    Date Published:February 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:February 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Discovery Letter]
    Date Published:February 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bail Report]
    Date Published:February 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA Form 23 - Financial Affidavit]
    Date Published:February 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Rule 5]
    Date Published:February 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
    Date Published:February 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:February 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum (Order)]
    Date Published:February 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:December 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:December 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment and Commitment-Supervised Release Revocation]
    Date Published:December 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
    Date Published:December 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:December 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling and Trial Order]
    Date Published:November 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Suppress]
    Date Published:November 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:November 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Conference]
    Date Published:November 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:November 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Probation 22 Documents Received]
    Date Published:November 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:November 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
    Date Published:November 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:November 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest - Other District ]
    Date Published:October 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Rule 5 Documents Received]
    Date Published:October 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
    Date Published:September 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:September 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:September 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
    Date Published:September 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:September 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:September 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Affidavit of Financial Status]
    Date Published:September 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Assignment Local Rule 2.08]
    Date Published:August 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:July 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment and Commitment]
    Date Published:July 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum]
    Date Published:July 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Filing]
    Date Published:May 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial / Supervised Release]
    Date Published:February 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Transferring/Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:January 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?118412
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =