open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Missouri
    Case Number:6:14-cr-03069-1
    Party Name:USA v. Jolander
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment and Commitment-Supervised Release Revocation]
    Date Published:March 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
    Date Published:March 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:December 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:December 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
    Date Published:December 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
    Date Published:December 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:December 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:December 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest ]
    Date Published:December 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:December 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial / Supervised Release]
    Date Published:October 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing Cancellation]
    Date Published:September 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:September 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment Returned Executed]
    Date Published:July 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?117245
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =