open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:12-cv-01410
    Party Name:Perkins v. Astrue
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
    Date Published:March 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply Suggestions to Motion]
    Date Published:October 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Suggestions in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:October 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Judgment]
    Date Published:August 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Oral Argument]
    Date Published:August 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:July 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Attorney Fees]
    Date Published:July 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Suggestions in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:July 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:July 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:July 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion to extend Social Security Deadlines]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?106858
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =