open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Missouri
    Case Number:2:14-cv-04200
    Party Name:Calvin v. Colvin
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
    Date Published:December 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:November 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:November 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Attorney Fees]
    Date Published:November 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Judgment]
    Date Published:September 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:August 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Transcript]
    Date Published:August 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Oral Argument]
    Date Published:August 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on motion for extension of Social Security deadlines]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?116714
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =