open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:13-cr-00310-1
    Party Name:USA v. Fears
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment and Commitment-Supervised Release Revocation]
    Date Published:June 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
    Date Published:June 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:June 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:June 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:June 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:June 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:June 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:June 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:June 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing Cancellation]
    Date Published:May 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:April 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
    Date Published:April 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Counsel Under CJA]
    Date Published:April 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:April 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
    Date Published:April 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:April 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest ]
    Date Published:April 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:January 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Affidavit of Financial Status]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?111230
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =