open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. District Court for the Western District of Missouri
    Case Number:2:20-mj-03015-1
    Party Name:USA v. Funk
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Detain]
    Date Published:September 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:[Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:September 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reason for Amendment to Judgment (Sealed)]
    Date Published:August 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amended Judgment and Commitment]
    Date Published:August 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion for Order]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Compassionate Release]
    Date Published:August 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
    Date Published:May 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Release from Custody]
    Date Published:April 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Transferring/Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter]
    Date Published:January 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment and Commitment-Supervised Release Revocation]
    Date Published:September 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
    Date Published:September 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Affidavit of Financial Status]
    Date Published:August 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:August 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
    Date Published:March 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:March 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
    Date Published:March 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:March 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:January 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Probation 22 Documents Received]
    Date Published:January 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:January 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
    Date Published:January 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Mandate]
    Date Published:December 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Judgment and/or Opinion]
    Date Published:December 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
    Date Published:November 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transmission of Notice of Appeal Supplement to US Court of Appeals]
    Date Published:November 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
    Date Published:November 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment and Commitment]
    Date Published:September 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:September 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum]
    Date Published:August 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Exhibit Index]
    Date Published:August 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:July 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:June 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSI]
    Date Published:June 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSI]
    Date Published:June 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transfer Order (ADMIN USE ONLY!)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:April 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Show Cause Hearing]
    Date Published:April 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:March 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial / Supervised Release]
    Date Published:March 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on motion for order]
    Date Published:March 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:February 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:January 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Filing]
    Date Published:January 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
    Date Published:August 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing Cancellation]
    Date Published:June 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:June 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:March 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Satisfaction of Judgment (Fine/Costs/Restitution)]
    Date Published:March 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Pretrial conference]
    Date Published:February 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Payment Voucher for Attorney Appointment]
    Date Published:August 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Unrestricted Petition for Action on Conditions or Term of Supervision]
    Date Published:February 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?118391
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =