open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Missouri
    Case Number:3:13-cr-05022-1
    Party Name:USA v. Seneca Companies,Inc. et al
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Suggestions in Support]
    Date Published:January 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
    Date Published:April 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Early Termination of Probation]
    Date Published:January 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Electronic Transcript]
    Date Published:July 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?109816
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =