open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:14-cv-00204
    Party Name:Speer et al v. Cerner Corporation
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Order of Dismissal]
    Date Published:June 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
    Date Published:June 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Settlement Conference]
    Date Published:June 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Attorney Fees]
    Date Published:May 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:March 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:December 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
    Date Published:December 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Staying Case]
    Date Published:September 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Settlement]
    Date Published:August 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal]
    Date Published:May 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to Appeal]
    Date Published:April 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:November 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:September 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Supplement]
    Date Published:July 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:July 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:July 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:July 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:April 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Stay]
    Date Published:April 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stay]
    Date Published:April 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Certify Class]
    Date Published:March 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Suggestions in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:March 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
    Date Published:March 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Seal Document]
    Date Published:February 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:February 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of transmission of deposition]
    Date Published:January 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:January 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:December 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Take Deposition]
    Date Published:December 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:December 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
    Date Published:December 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
    Date Published:November 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:October 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:October 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Sealed)]
    Date Published:October 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:October 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Suggestions in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:October 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Partial Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:October 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
    Date Published:October 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certify Class]
    Date Published:August 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply Suggestions to Motion]
    Date Published:August 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [File Excess Pages]
    Date Published:August 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Suggestions in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:August 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Docket Modification]
    Date Published:August 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time ]
    Date Published:August 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:August 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:July 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:July 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:July 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines]
    Date Published:July 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Transferring/Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:July 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing]
    Date Published:July 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Strike]
    Date Published:June 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?113964
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =