open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:14-cv-00793
    Party Name:Campbell v. Accounts Receivable Management, Inc.
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Judgment]
    Date Published:March 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:January 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
    Date Published:January 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:August 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:August 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:August 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Limine]
    Date Published:August 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Suggestions in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:August 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:July 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to answer]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?117451
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =