open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Missouri
    Case Number:2:05-cv-04204
    Party Name:Stewart v. Dormire
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Mandate]
    Date Published:April 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Judgment and/or Opinion]
    Date Published:April 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Order]
    Date Published:April 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
    Date Published:April 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appeal]
    Date Published:April 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:March 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:March 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Receipt]
    Date Published:July 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?72778
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =