open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:19-43745
    Party Name:Katherine A Gardner
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:August 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Internet Credit Card Receipt]
    Date Published:June 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Transfer of Claim]
    Date Published:June 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Trustee's Intent to Pay Claims]
    Date Published:May 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Trustee's Notice of Lack of Feasibility (batch)]
    Date Published:September 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Hearing Held - Plan Confirmed]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Wage Order]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Automatic Stay]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Expedite Hearing]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Wage Motion]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Corrected PDF]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Notice of Errors in Electronically Filed Documents - Refile Required]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Impose Automatic Stay]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Expediting Hearing]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Amended Schedules]
    Date Published:January 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Chapter 13 Official Form 122]
    Date Published:December 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Declaration Concerning Debtor's Schedules]
    Date Published:December 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Schedules A-J]
    Date Published:December 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:December 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
    Date Published:December 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:December 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:December 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:December 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Extend Automatic Stay]
    Date Published:December 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Order and Notice of Failure to Pay Filing Fee Through Internet]
    Date Published:November 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [14-Day Order and Notice of Missing Documents]
    Date Published:November 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Attorney Fee Election Form (DO NOT COMBINE WITH OTHER EVENTS)]
    Date Published:November 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [B121 Form (DO NOT COMBINE WITH OTHER EVENTS)]
    Date Published:November 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:November 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Voluntary Petition - Attorney (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:November 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Objection to Application for Compensation]
    Date Published:August 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:July 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [none]
    Date Published:May 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Vacate]
    Date Published:March 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Consent]
    Date Published:March 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Reinstate Case]
    Date Published:March 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Vacate/Set Aside]
    Date Published:March 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:February 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Final Decree]
    Date Published:February 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Trustee's Certification of Estate]
    Date Published:February 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:December 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
    Date Published:December 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Approving Final Report & Account]
    Date Published:November 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Order on UST Application for Compensation]
    Date Published:November 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:November 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Objection to Claim]
    Date Published:November 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Notice of Final Report - NFR]
    Date Published:October 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [UST - Application for Compensation]
    Date Published:October 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Chapter 7 Final Rpt/Acct-Asset]
    Date Published:October 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Final Cost Bill]
    Date Published:October 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Request for Final Cost Bill]
    Date Published:October 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Reminder Notice of Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:October 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan (batch)]
    Date Published:September 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:September 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:September 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (batch)]
    Date Published:September 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Motion and Order Approving Substitution of Attorney]
    Date Published:August 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Receipt for Full Filing Fee - IFP/Installment Denied]
    Date Published:August 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:August 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:August 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
    Date Published:August 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:August 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Notice (Generic)]
    Date Published:July 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Compensation]
    Date Published:July 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Generic Order]
    Date Published:June 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Generic Motion]
    Date Published:June 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
    Date Published:June 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:June 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Compromise Controversy]
    Date Published:May 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Motion and Order Approving Substitution of Attorney]
    Date Published:April 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:April 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Compensation]
    Date Published:April 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Notice of Unpaid Filing Fee]
    Date Published:April 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Dismissing Case - BK]
    Date Published:April 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (batch)]
    Date Published:March 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:March 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:March 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:March 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Hearing Continued]
    Date Published:March 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:March 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Response]
    Date Published:March 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Chapter 13 Trustee Tansfer Event for ADI]
    Date Published:February 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:February 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Amended Schedules]
    Date Published:February 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:January 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Notice of Submitting Interim Report]
    Date Published:January 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:January 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:January 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Employ]
    Date Published:January 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:December 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Response]
    Date Published:December 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Notice of Assets]
    Date Published:December 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Withdrawal of Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:December 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:December 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Clerk's Notice of Fees Due]
    Date Published:December 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
    Date Published:December 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Reopen Case]
    Date Published:December 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Reopen Case (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:December 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Hearing Continued]
    Date Published:December 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:December 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan (batch)]
    Date Published:December 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:December 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Reminder Notice of Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:November 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:November 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:November 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Amended Petition]
    Date Published:October 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
    Date Published:October 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:October 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Schedule J]
    Date Published:October 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Schedule I]
    Date Published:October 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Schedule H]
    Date Published:October 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Schedule G]
    Date Published:October 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Schedule E/F]
    Date Published:October 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Schedule D]
    Date Published:October 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Schedule C]
    Date Published:October 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Schedule A/B]
    Date Published:October 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Declaration Concerning Debtor's Schedules]
    Date Published:October 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Chapter 13 Official Form 122]
    Date Published:October 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:October 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Extend Time]
    Date Published:October 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:October 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:October 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:October 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:October 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
    Date Published:October 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [14-Day Order and Notice of Missing Documents]
    Date Published:October 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Attorney Fee Election Form (DO NOT COMBINE WITH OTHER EVENTS)]
    Date Published:October 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [none]
    Date Published:October 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Attorney Fee Election Form (DO NOT COMBINE WITH OTHER EVENTS)]
    Date Published:October 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [none]
    Date Published:October 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:October 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:October 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:October 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:October 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Voluntary Petition - Attorney (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:October 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [B121 Form (DO NOT COMBINE WITH OTHER EVENTS)]
    Date Published:October 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition - Attorney (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:October 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [B121 Form (DO NOT COMBINE WITH OTHER EVENTS)]
    Date Published:October 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Trustee's Initial Report]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.moeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?377074
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =