open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Missouri
    Case Number:12-41456-drd13
    Party Name:Christopher Wesley Scheiderer and Melanie D Scheiderer --ABOVE MED--
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Close Bankruptcy Case - Ch 9/11/12/13]
    Date Published:August 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Substitute Creditor Attorney - text only]
    Date Published:August 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Order Final Account Ch 13 (COMPLETE)(m)]
    Date Published:July 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [13 Notice of Final Report (b)]
    Date Published:July 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Ch 13 Trustee Final Report - Completion]
    Date Published:July 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Ntc Final Cure Mortgage Payment APPROVED]
    Date Published:June 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Response in Agreement to Ntc of Final Cure Pmt Rule 3002.1]
    Date Published:May 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Notice of Final Cure Mortgage Payment]
    Date Published:May 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:May 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Chapter 13 Discharge]
    Date Published:April 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [13 Trustee Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:April 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Ch 13 FMC Notice re Discharge]
    Date Published:April 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Ch 13 Trustee Ntc of Plan Completion]
    Date Published:April 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [CSAW Cancel Wage]
    Date Published:April 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:July 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:April 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?289494
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =